Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/21/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/21/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/24/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/24/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/08/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/20/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/25/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/25/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/25/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/04/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/04/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/04/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/30/2000