Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/26/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/26/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/29/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/11/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/12/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/12/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/13/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/14/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/14/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/21/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/24/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/25/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/27/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/06/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/06/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/07/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/11/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/11/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/12/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/20/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/22/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/28/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/28/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/05/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/12/2000