Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/27/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/11/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/11/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/25/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/27/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/05/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2000