There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide a waiver of the oath of renunciation and allegiance for naturalization of aliens having certain disabilities.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
11/06/2000Became Public Law No: 106-448. (TXT | PDF)
11/06/2000Signed by President.
10/26/2000Presented to President.
10/19/2000Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10843; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S10843)
10/10/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9548)
10/10/2000Committee on Judiciary discharged.
07/21/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7456; text: CR S7456)
07/20/2000Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
06/29/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/06/2000Became Public Law No: 106-448. (TXT | PDF)
11/06/2000Signed by President.
10/26/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/20/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/19/2000SenateSenate agreed the House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10843; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S10843)
10/11/2000SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
10/10/2000-4:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/2000-4:39pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 4838 was laid on the table without objection.
10/10/2000-4:39pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9548)
10/10/2000-4:38pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 4838. Agreed to without objection.
10/10/2000-4:38pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9548)
10/10/2000-4:38pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/10/2000HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
07/24/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/24/2000-7:08pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/21/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7456; text: CR S7456)
07/20/2000SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/20/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 693.
07/20/2000SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
06/29/2000SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6122)
06/29/2000SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6121-6122)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/29/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/29/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/29/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/29/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/29/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/29/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/29/2000 Referred to
07/20/2000 Markup by
07/20/2000 Reported by
House Judiciary07/24/2000 Referred to
10/10/2000 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2812. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/29/2000)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize the Attorney General to waive the taking of the naturalization oath of renunciation and allegiance for an alien with a disability, or a child, who is unable to understand or communicate an understanding of such oath.