Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/26/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/03/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/03/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/03/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/09/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/12/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/24/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/25/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/02/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/02/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/02/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/08/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/13/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/05/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/17/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/18/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/18/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/19/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/24/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/26/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/07/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/07/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/10/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/10/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/14/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/15/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/18/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/21/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/23/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/30/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/12/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/20/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/30/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/04/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/08/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/08/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/14/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/24/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 01/31/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/01/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/01/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/07/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/22/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/24/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/04/2000