There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect religious liberty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2000Became Public Law No: 106-274. (TXT | PDF)
09/22/2000Signed by President.
09/18/2000Presented to President.
07/27/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7191-7192)
07/27/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7774-7781; text as passed Senate: CR S7779-7781)
07/13/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2000Became Public Law No: 106-274. (TXT | PDF)
09/22/2000Signed by President.
09/18/2000SenatePresented to President.
07/27/2000-6:27pmHouseSee also H.R. 1691.
07/27/2000-6:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2000-6:24pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7191-7192)
07/27/2000-6:20pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7190-7192)
07/27/2000-6:20pmHouseMr. Canady asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/27/2000-6:08pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/27/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7774-7781; text as passed Senate: CR S7779-7781)
07/14/2000SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 684.
07/13/2000SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
07/13/2000SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6687-6688)

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (0)

As of 05/15/2021 text has not been received for S.2869 - Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act of 2000

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2869. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/13/2000)

Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act of 2000 - Prohibits any government from imposing or implementing a land use regulation in a manner that imposes a substantial burden on the religious exercise of a person, including a religious assembly or institution, unless the government demonstrates that imposition of the burden on that person, assembly, or institution: (1) is in furtherance of a compelling governmental interest; and (2) is the least restrictive means of furthering that compelling governmental interest.

Prohibits any government from imposing a substantial burden on the religious exercise of a person residing in or confined to an institution, as defined in the Civil Rights of Institutionalized Persons Act, even if the burden results from a rule of general applicability, unless the government demonstrates that imposition of the burden on that person: (1) is in furtherance of a compelling governmental interest; and (2) is the least restrictive means of furthering that compelling governmental interest. States that nothing in this Act shall be construed to amend or repeal the Prison Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (including provisions of law amended by that Act).