There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Santo Domingo Pueblo Claims Settlement Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Santo Domingo Pueblo Claims Settlement Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to settle the land claims of the Pueblo of Santo Domingo.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-425. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000Presented to President.
10/18/2000By Senator Campbell from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 106-506.
10/17/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9963-9965)
10/11/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10268-10270)
10/11/2000Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10268-10270)
07/25/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-425. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/18/2000SenateBy Senator Campbell from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 106-506.
10/17/2000-1:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-1:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9963-9965)
10/17/2000-1:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2917.
10/17/2000-1:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9963-9966)
10/17/2000-1:54pmHouseMr. Calvert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/16/2000HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/12/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/12/2000-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
10/12/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10268-10270)
10/11/2000SenateSenate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10268-10270)
09/27/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/25/2000SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
07/25/2000SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7545-7546)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/25/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs07/25/2000 Referred to
09/27/2000 Markup by
10/11/2000 Discharged from
House Resources10/12/2000 Referred to
10/16/2000 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.2917.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2917. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/26/2000)

Santo Domingo Pueblo Claims Settlement Act of 2000 - Approves the May 2000 Settlement Agreement between the Departments of the Interior, Agriculture, and Justice and the Pueblo of Santo Domingo (New Mexico) to Resolve All of the Pueblo's Land Title and Trespass Claims.

Extinguishes certain Pueblo land and trespass claims. Sets forth provisions relating to the treatment of land or natural resources transferred by the Pueblo prior to this Act's enactment date and ratifies such transfers. Makes this paragraph effective upon the entry of a compromise final judgment in the case of Pueblo of Santo Domingo v. United States.

Establishes the Pueblo of Santo Domingo Land Claims Settlement Fund to be expended by the Pueblo to acquire lands within the exterior boundaries of the exclusive aboriginal occupancy area of the Pueblo and for use for other tribal purposes. Authorizes appropriations. Prohibits disbursal of amounts in the Fund until: (1) the case of Pueblo of Santo Domingo v. Rael has been dismissed with prejudice; and (2) the compromise final judgment described above has been entered in the U.S. Court of Federal Claims.

Declares the boundaries of the Santo Domingo Pueblo Grant, as determined by the 1907 Hall-Joy Survey, to be the current boundaries of the Grant and that any lands currently owned or hereafter acquired by the Pueblo within such boundaries or the Grant shall be considered to be Indian country.