Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/26/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/05/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/05/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/05/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/05/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/07/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/07/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/07/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/07/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/12/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/12/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/12/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/12/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/12/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/20/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/28/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/28/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/28/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/28/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/04/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/12/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/18/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/18/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/18/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/18/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/18/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/18/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/18/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/18/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/19/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/19/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/19/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/24/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/26/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/27/2000