Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/22/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/22/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/24/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/24/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/24/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/04/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/04/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/18/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/18/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/22/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/12/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/12/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/13/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/14/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/19/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/27/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/03/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/19/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/20/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/08/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/10/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/22/1999