Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 07/27/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/27/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 07/27/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 07/27/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/19/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/22/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/26/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/26/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/27/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/27/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/02/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/02/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/04/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/04/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/05/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/05/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/05/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/05/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/05/2000