Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/12/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/13/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/13/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/14/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/14/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/20/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/28/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/19/2000