Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 09/06/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/07/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/19/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/20/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/26/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/28/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/04/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/04/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/11/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/18/2000