Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/19/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/21/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/27/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/10/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2000