Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/21/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 09/21/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 09/21/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/21/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 09/21/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/02/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 10/02/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/04/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/04/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/06/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/06/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/10/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/10/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/12/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/12/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/12/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/12/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/12/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/12/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/12/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/18/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/18/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/18/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/18/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/18/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/18/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/19/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/19/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/19/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/23/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/23/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/24/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/24/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/25/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/25/2000