Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/26/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/24/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/26/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/19/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/26/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/15/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/05/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 08/05/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/28/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/30/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/25/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/20/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/26/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/18/2000