Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/25/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/28/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/28/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/02/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/02/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/03/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/04/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/04/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/04/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/04/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/05/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/05/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/10/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/11/2000