Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 09/26/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 09/26/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/27/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/03/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/04/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/05/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/05/2000