Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/03/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/05/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/05/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/06/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/06/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/10/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/10/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/10/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/11/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/11/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/11/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/11/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/11/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/12/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/17/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/17/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/17/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/18/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/25/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/31/2000