Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/12/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/18/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/18/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/18/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/19/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/19/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/19/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/19/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/23/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/23/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/23/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 10/23/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/24/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/25/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/25/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/25/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/25/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/25/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/26/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/26/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/26/2000