Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/15/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/17/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/11/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/17/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/03/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/23/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/10/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/10/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/10/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/10/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/10/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/10/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 11/10/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/10/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/10/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/10/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/10/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/10/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/10/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 11/10/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/10/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/10/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/10/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/10/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/10/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/10/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 11/10/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/10/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/10/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/10/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/10/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/10/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/10/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/10/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/10/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/10/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/10/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/10/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/10/1999
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/10/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/10/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/10/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/10/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/10/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/10/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/10/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/10/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/10/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/19/1999