Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/28/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/28/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/03/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/03/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/04/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/08/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/08/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/08/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/08/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/08/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/08/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/08/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/08/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/10/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/22/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/22/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/24/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/24/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/24/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/02/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/03/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/03/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/04/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/04/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/04/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/04/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/08/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/10/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/10/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/10/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/16/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/16/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/23/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/14/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/15/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/20/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/20/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/06/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/18/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/24/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/27/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/16/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/16/1999