Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/12/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/12/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/22/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/04/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/04/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/04/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/04/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/08/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/08/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/15/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/15/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/15/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/15/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/15/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/15/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/18/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/23/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/23/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/23/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/14/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/14/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/14/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/14/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/14/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 05/18/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/07/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/09/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/13/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/27/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 08/02/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 08/02/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 08/02/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/02/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/02/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/02/1999