There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Animal Welfare Act to remove the limitation that permits interstate movement of live birds, for the purpose of fighting, to States in which animal fighting is lawful.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/17/2000Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported to Senate by Senator Lugar without amendment. With written report No. 106-297.
02/03/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
05/17/2000Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 555.
Action By: Senate
05/17/2000Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported to Senate by Senator Lugar without amendment. With written report No. 106-297.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry
03/02/2000Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry
02/03/1999Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: Senate
02/03/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1157)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/22/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/15/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/24/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/03/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/11/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/19/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/08/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/21/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/13/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/13/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/28/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/08/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/12/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/28/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/28/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/29/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/29/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/01/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/02/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/03/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/04/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/05/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/08/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/16/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/17/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 11/18/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/18/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/19/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/07/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/28/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/29/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/29/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/03/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/08/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/10/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/17/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/18/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/23/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/07/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/09/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/13/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/22/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/18/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/19/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/24/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/05/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/04/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry02/03/1999 Referred to
03/02/2000 Markup by
05/17/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-297

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.345. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/03/1999)

Amends the Animal Welfare Act to eliminate the provision permitting interstate movement of live fighting birds if the fighting venture is to take place in a State allowing such fights.