Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/22/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/22/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/15/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/24/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/03/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/11/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/19/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/08/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/21/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/13/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/13/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/28/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/08/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/12/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/28/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/28/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/29/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/29/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/01/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/02/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/03/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/04/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/05/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 11/08/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/16/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/17/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 11/18/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/18/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/19/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/07/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/28/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/29/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/29/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/03/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/08/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/10/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/17/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/18/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/23/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/07/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/09/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/13/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/22/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/18/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/19/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/24/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/05/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/04/2000