Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/23/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/15/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/17/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/24/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/13/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/13/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/15/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/30/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/30/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/18/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/19/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/20/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/08/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/24/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/23/1999