Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/03/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/13/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/23/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/24/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/09/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/21/2000