Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/04/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/17/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/17/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/17/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/18/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/22/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/25/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/25/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/25/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/04/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/01/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/01/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/01/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/01/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/22/1999