Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/09/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/09/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/09/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/09/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/09/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 02/22/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/24/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/25/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/02/1999