There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Alaska Native and American Indian Direct Reimbursement Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Alaska Native and American Indian Direct Reimbursement Act of 1999

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Alaska Native and American Indian Direct Reimbursement Act of 1999

Short Titles as Introduced

Alaska Native and American Indian Direct Reimbursement Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to make permanent the demonstration program that allows for direct billing of medicare, medicaid, and other third party payors, and to expand the eligibility under such program to other tribes and tribal organizations.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-417. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000Presented to President.
10/17/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9957-9958)
09/06/2000Committee on Commerce discharged.
09/06/2000Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/06/2000Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-818, Part I.
09/15/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10959-10960)
09/08/1999Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-152.
02/10/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/01/2000Became Public Law No: 106-417. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2000Signed by President.
10/20/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/17/2000-1:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/17/2000-1:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9957-9958)
10/17/2000-1:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 406.
10/17/2000-1:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9957-9959)
10/17/2000-1:25pmHouseMr. Calvert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/06/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 480.
09/06/2000HouseCommittee on Commerce discharged.
09/06/2000HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/06/2000HouseHouse Committee on Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 6, 2000.
09/06/2000HouseHouse Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 6, 2000.
09/06/2000HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-818, Part I.
04/05/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/05/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/06/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
09/20/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/17/1999HouseReferred to House Commerce
09/17/1999HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
09/17/1999HouseReferred to House Resources
09/17/1999HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/17/1999-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
09/15/1999SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10959-10960)
09/15/1999SenateThe committee substitute agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10959-10960; text: CR S10959-10960)
09/08/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.
09/08/1999SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-152.
08/04/1999SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-204.
08/04/1999SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/10/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
02/10/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1429)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/08/1999

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Indian Affairs02/10/1999 Referred to
08/04/1999 Hearings by
08/04/1999 Markup by
09/08/1999 Reported by S. Rept. 106-152
House Resources09/17/1999 Referred to
04/05/2000 Markup by
09/06/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-818
House Ways and Means09/17/1999 Referred to
09/06/2000 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/20/1999 Referred to
House Commerce09/17/1999 Referred to
09/06/2000 Discharged from
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/06/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.406.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.406. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/15/1999)

Alaska Native and American Indian Direct Reimbursement Act of 1999 - Amends the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to make permanent the demonstration program under which Indian tribes, tribal organizations, and Alaska Native health organizations that contract or compact for the operation of a hospital or clinic of the Indian Health Service may directly bill for, and receive payment for, health care services provided by such hospital or clinic for which payment is made under titles XVIII (Medicare) or XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act or from any other third party payor.

Requires participating hospitals and clinics to submit annual reports on the program to the Secretary of Health and Human Services.

Provides for: (1) application to the Secretary by an Indian tribe, tribal organization, or Alaska Native health organization for participation of a Service facility in the program (the demonstration program was limited to four facilities); (2) the ongoing examination and implementation of necessary administrative changes to facilitate direct billing and reimbursement under the program; and (3) withdrawal from participation in the program.