Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/10/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/25/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/25/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/20/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/12/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/12/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/13/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/19/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/15/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/1999