Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/11/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/11/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/11/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/11/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/12/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/12/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/20/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/09/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/10/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/14/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/17/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/22/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/01/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/12/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/15/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/14/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/21/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/01/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/16/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/23/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/23/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/21/2000