Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/29/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 08/05/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/09/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/21/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/04/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/03/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew