There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Bring Them Home Alive Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Bring Them Home Alive Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Bring Them Home Alive Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the granting of refugee status in the United States to nationals of certain foreign countries in which American Vietnam War POW/MIAs or American Korean War POW/MIAs may be present, if those nationals assist in the return to the United States of those POW/MIAs alive.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/09/2000Became Public Law No: 106-484. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2000Signed by President.
11/03/2000Presented to President.
10/24/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10703-10704)
10/24/2000Committee on International Relations discharged.
10/24/2000Committee on Judiciary discharged.
05/24/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4395-4396)
05/18/2000Committee on the Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
02/25/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
11/09/2000Became Public Law No: 106-484. (TXT | PDF)
11/09/2000Signed by President.
11/03/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/24/2000-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/24/2000-7:07pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10703-10704)
10/24/2000-7:06pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10703-10705)
10/24/2000-7:06pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/24/2000HouseCommittee on International Relations discharged.
10/24/2000HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
09/07/2000HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
09/07/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
07/17/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/01/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/25/2000HouseReferred to House International Relations
05/25/2000HouseReferred to House Judiciary
05/25/2000HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/25/2000-10:07amHouseReceived in the House.
05/25/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4395-4396)
05/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.3171 Amendment SA 3171 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4395)
05/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.3171 Amendment SA 3171 proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Helms. (consideration: CR S4395-4396) To make technical amendments.
05/24/2000SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4395-4396)
05/18/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560.
05/18/2000SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/18/2000SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/24/1999SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Immigration.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/25/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2026-2027)
02/25/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2025-2028)

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/25/1999 Referred to
05/18/2000 Markup by
05/18/2000 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration03/24/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary05/25/2000 Referred to
10/24/2000 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims06/01/2000 Referred to
House International Relations05/25/2000 Referred to
09/07/2000 Markup by
10/24/2000 Discharged from
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights07/17/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.484. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/24/2000)

Bring Them Home Alive Act of 2000 - Directs the Attorney General to grant refugee status in the United States to any alien (and the parent, spouse, or child of such alien) who: (1) is a national of Vietnam, Cambodia, Laos, China, or any of the independent states of the former Soviet Union; and (2) personally delivers into U.S. custody a living American Vietnam War POW or MIA.

Requires the granting of the same status to any alien (and parent, spouse, or child) who is a national of North Korea, China, or any of the independent states of the former Soviet Union and who personally delivers a living American Korean War POW or MIA.

Directs the International Broadcasting Bureau to broadcast to such foreign countries information that promotes such ("Bring Them Home Alive") refugee programs. Requires: (1) a minimum programming level for such broadcasting; and (2) the Bureau to ensure that such information is made available on the Internet.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that RFE/RL, Inc., Radio Free Asia, and any other recipient of Federal grants that broadcasts to such countries should also broadcast such information.