There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Spanish Peaks Wilderness Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Spanish Peaks Wilderness Act of 2000

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Spanish Peaks Wilderness Act of 1999

Short Titles as Introduced

Spanish Peaks Wilderness Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill designating certain land in the San Isabel National Forest in the State of Colorado as the "Spanish Peaks Wilderness".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/07/2000Became Public Law No: 106-456. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2000Signed by President.
11/01/2000Presented to President.
10/23/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10513)
04/13/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2792-2793; text of measure as passed Senate: CR S2792-2793)
03/09/2000Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 106-233.
03/02/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/07/2000Became Public Law No: 106-456. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2000Signed by President.
11/01/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/23/2000-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/23/2000-2:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10513)
10/23/2000-2:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 503.
10/23/2000-2:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10513-10514)
10/23/2000-2:57pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/02/2000-7:13pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/02/2000-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/02/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/13/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2792-2793; text of measure as passed Senate: CR S2792-2793)
03/09/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 449.
03/09/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 106-233.
02/10/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/23/1999SenateSubcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-207.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management
03/03/1999SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/02/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/02/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2111)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/02/1999 Referred to
02/10/2000 Markup by
03/09/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-233
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management03/03/1999 Referred to
06/23/1999 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.503. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (04/13/2000)

Spanish Peaks Wilderness Act of 2000 - Amends the Colorado Wilderness Act of 1993 to designate certain lands in the San Isabel National Forest, Colorado, as the Spanish Peaks Wilderness. Requires: (1) the Secretary of Agriculture to allow the continuation of historic uses of the Bulls Eye Mine Road; and (2) access to be provided to any privately owned land within the Wilderness in accordance with the Wilderness Act.