Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/25/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/25/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/25/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/04/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/04/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/24/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/28/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 11/09/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/17/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/03/2000