There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Beaches Environmental Assessment and Coastal Health Act of 2000

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Beaches Environmental Assessment and Coastal Health Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Beaches Environmental Assessment, Closure, and Health Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to improve the quality of beaches and coastal recreation water, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/21/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9001-9002)
08/25/2000Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-366.
03/03/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/22/2000-12:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/22/2000-12:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/22/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/21/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9001-9002)
09/21/2000SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/2000SenateS.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/2000SenateS.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 proposed by Senator Smith NH. (consideration: CR S9000) To provide a complete substitute.
09/21/2000SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8998-9003; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S8998-9000)
08/25/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 743.
08/25/2000SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/26/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-366.
04/13/2000SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/22/1999SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-284.
03/03/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2214-2215)
03/03/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2213-2214)

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/03/1999 Referred to
07/22/1999 Hearings by
04/13/2000 Markup by
08/25/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-366

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.522. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/21/2000)

Beaches Environmental Assessment and Coastal Health Act of 2000- Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to require States having coastal recreation waters to adopt water quality criteria and standards for such waters for pathogens and pathogen indicators for which the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency has published criteria under such Act. Requires States to adopt new or revised standards for such waters after the Administrator publishes new or revised criteria.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Administrator to complete studies for use in developing: (1) an assessment of potential health risks from exposure to pathogens in coastal recreation waters; (2) appropriate and effective indicators and appropriate, accurate, and expeditious methods for detecting or predicting the presence of pathogens in coastal recreational waters; and (3) guidance for State application of the criteria for pathogens to account for the diversity of geographic and aquatic conditions. Requires the Administrator to publish new or revised water quality criteria for pathogens in such waters for purposes of protecting human health.

(Sec. 4) Directs the Administrator to publish performance criteria for: (1) the monitoring and assessment of, and specifying methods for monitoring, coastal recreation waters adjacent to public beaches for attainment of water quality standards for pathogens; and (2) prompt notification of local governments, the public, and the Administrator of exceedances, or the likelihood of exceedances, of standards for such waters.

Authorizes the Administrator to make grants to States and local governments to implement monitoring and notification programs. Lists requirements for such programs.

Requires Federal agencies to develop such programs for coastal recreation waters adjacent to public beaches subject to their jurisdiction that protect public health and safety, meet the performance criteria under this Act, and address certain matters required for State and local programs.

Directs the Administrator to: (1) establish a national coastal recreation water pollution occurrence database; and (2) provide technical assistance for development of assessment and monitoring procedures for floatable materials in such waters.

Requires the Administrator, with respect to States without monitoring and notification programs, to conduct such programs for coastal recreation waters adjacent to public beaches in such States.

Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 6) Treats Indian tribes as States for purposes of provisions of this Act regarding coastal recreation water quality monitoring and notification programs and grants.

(Sec. 8) Authorizes appropriations to carry out this Act.