Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/04/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/04/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/04/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/04/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 03/04/1999
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/08/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/08/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/08/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/08/1999
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/10/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/10/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/10/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/15/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/15/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/15/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/16/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/16/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/16/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/16/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/16/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/17/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/17/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/18/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/22/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/22/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/22/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/22/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/22/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/22/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/22/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/22/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/22/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/22/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/22/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/23/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/24/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/25/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/25/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/12/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/12/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/12/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/12/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/12/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/12/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/12/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/12/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/12/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/12/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/12/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/12/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/12/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/12/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/12/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/12/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/12/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/12/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/13/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/13/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/13/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/13/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/13/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/13/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/13/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/13/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/14/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/14/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/14/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/14/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/14/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/14/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/15/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/15/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 04/15/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/19/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/19/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/19/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 04/19/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/19/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/19/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/19/1999