Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/05/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/21/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/21/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/22/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/15/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/16/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/03/1999