Text: S.604 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-41 (08/05/1999)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 41]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ041.106]


[[Page 113 STAT. 215]]

Public Law 106-41
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to complete a land exchange with 
       Georgia Power Company. <<NOTE: Aug. 5, 1999 -  [S. 604]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Lake Oconee Land 
Exchange Act.>> 

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Lake Oconee Land Exchange Act''.

SEC. 2. LAKE OCONEE LAND EXCHANGE.

    (a) Definitions.--In this section:
            (1) Description of the boundary.--The term ``description of 
        the boundary'' means the documents entitled ``Description of the 
        Boundary'' dated September 6, 1996, prepared by the Forest 
        Service and on file with the Secretary.
            (2) Exchange agreement.--The term ``exchange agreement'' 
        means the agreement between Georgia Power Company and the Forest 
        Service dated December 26, 1996, as amended on August 17, 1998, 
        on file with the Secretary.
            (3) Georgia power company.--The term ``Georgia Power 
        Company'' means Georgia Power Company, a division of the 
        Southern Company, a Georgia corporation, or its successors or 
        assigns.
            (4) Secretary.--The term ``Secretary'' means the Secretary 
        of Agriculture.

    (b) Land Exchange.--
            (1) In general.--Simultaneously with conveyance by Georgia 
        Power Company to the Secretary of all right, title, and interest 
        in and to the land described in paragraph (2), the Secretary 
        shall--
                    (A) convey to Georgia Power Company all right, 
                title, and interest in and to the land described in 
                paragraph (3), except as provided in the exchange 
                agreement; and
                    (B) make a value equalization payment of $23,250 to 
                Georgia Power Company.
            (2) Land to be conveyed to the secretary.--The land 
        described in this paragraph is the land within or near the 
        Chattahoochee National Forest and Oconee National Forest in the 
        State of Georgia, comprising approximately 1,175.46 acres, 
        described in the exchange agreement and the description of the 
        boundary.
            (3) Land to be conveyed to georgia power company.--The land 
        described in this paragraph is the land in the State

[[Page 113 STAT. 216]]

        of Georgia, comprising approximately 1,275.80 acres, described 
        in the exchange agreement and the description of the boundary.

    (c) Partial Revocation of Withdrawals.--
            (1) In general.--The orders issued by the Federal Energy 
        Regulatory Commission under section 24 of the Federal Power Act 
        (16 U.S.C. 818), authorizing Power Project Numbers 2413 and 
        2354, issued August 6, 1969, and October 1, 1996, respectively, 
        are revoked insofar as the orders affect the land described in 
        subsection (b)(3).
            (2) No annual charge.--No interest conveyed to Georgia Power 
        Company or easement right retained by Georgia Power Company 
        under this section shall be subject to an annual charge for the 
        purpose of compensating the United States for the use of its 
        land for power purposes.

    Approved Aug. 5, 1999.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 604:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 145 (1999):
            June 28, considered and passed Senate.
            July 26, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>

Share This