Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/15/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/15/1999
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/15/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/12/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/19/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/27/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/20/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/03/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/03/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 08/03/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/20/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/06/2000