Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/16/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/19/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/19/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/24/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/13/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/20/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/29/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/03/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/03/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/03/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/20/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/24/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/08/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/10/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/1999
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/23/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/30/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/13/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/15/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/19/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/21/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/22/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/26/1999