Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/18/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 03/18/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/26/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/05/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/12/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/12/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/08/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/10/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/17/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/01/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/13/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/07/1999