Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/23/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/25/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/25/1999
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/25/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/25/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/25/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/25/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/12/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/12/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/12/1999
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/12/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/12/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/19/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/26/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/03/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/03/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/03/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/15/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/28/1999