Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/21/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/24/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/12/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/22/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/26/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/26/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/27/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/21/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/05/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/22/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/02/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2000