There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Coral Reef Conservation Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to preserve and protect coral reefs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/25/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/15/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11893-11894)
Action By: Senate
06/30/1999Subcommittee on Oceans and Fisheries. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Oceans and Fisheries
03/25/1999Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate
03/25/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3453)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/11/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/25/1999 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Oceans and Fisheries06/30/1999 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.725.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.725. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/25/1999)

Coral Reef Conservation Act of 1999 - Directs the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to provide grants for the conservation of coral reefs.

Limits the Federal share to 50 percent of the total cost of any coral conservation project. Authorizes waivers.

Allows any relevant natural resource management authority of a State or U.S. territory or other government authority with jurisdiction over coral reefs or whose activities affect coral reefs, or educational or non-governmental institutions with demonstrated expertise in the conservation of coral reefs, to submit to the Administrator a coral conservation proposal.

Requires the Administrator to ensure that funding for grants awarded is distributed in following manner: (1) no less than 40 percent of available funds shall be awarded for coral conservation projects in the Pacific Ocean, Atlantic Ocean, Gulf of Mexico, and the Carribean Sea; and (2) remaining funds shall be awarded for projects that address emerging priorities or threats identified in consultation with the Coral Reef Task Force.

Sets forth proposal review guidelines, project approval criteria, and grantee reporting requirements.

Authorizes the Administrator to consult with the Task Force to obtain guidance in establishing coral conservation project priorities.

Authorizes the Administrator to enter into an agreement authorizing an organization to receive, hold, and administer funds received pursuant to this Act to support partnerships between the public and private sectors that further the purposes of this Act.

Authorizes the Administrator to make grants to any State, local, or territorial government agency with jurisdiction over coral reefs for emergencies to address unforseen or disaster related circumstance pertaining to coral reefs or coral reef ecosystems.

Authorizes appropriations.