Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/25/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/10/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/18/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/22/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/21/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 08/05/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/23/1999
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/23/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/29/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/29/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/30/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/30/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/30/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/06/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/06/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/06/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/08/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/20/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 01/24/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/08/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew