Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/08/1999
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/08/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/08/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/08/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/08/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/19/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/19/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/19/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/19/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/19/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/26/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/26/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/26/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 08/02/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/28/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/13/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/13/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/14/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/29/1999