Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/13/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/30/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/06/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/12/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/13/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/28/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/08/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/09/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/22/2000