Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/15/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/15/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/15/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/19/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/17/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/17/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/21/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/30/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/12/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/13/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/26/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/24/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/29/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/20/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/21/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/30/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/10/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/24/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/06/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/27/2000