Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/22/1999
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/13/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/27/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/07/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/17/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/31/2000